NY A09462 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-04 - signed chap.338
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-04 - signed chap.338
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Postpones expiration of certain tax rates and taxes in the city of New York.
Title
Postpones expiration of certain tax rates and taxes in the city of New York.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 111 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 111 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-04 | Senate | signed chap.338 |
2014-08-25 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-20 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2014-06-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1565 |
2014-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7386 |
2014-06-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | home rule request |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.200 |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.200 |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S07386 (Same As) 2014-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9462