NY A09390 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Introduced on April 25 2014 - 25% progress
Action: 2014-05-28 - substituted by s6248
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to eligible years for payment in lieu of taxes for certain agreements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to eligible years for payment in lieu of taxes for certain agreements.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-28Assemblysubstituted by s6248
2014-05-15Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.723
2014-05-13Assemblyreported
2014-04-25Assemblyreferred to ways and means

Same As/Similar To

S06248 (Same As) 2014-07-22 - SIGNED CHAP.145

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback