NY A09390 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progress
Action: 2012-08-17 - signed chap.386
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the definition of private transfer fee obligations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the definition of private transfer fee obligations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-20 - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-08-17Senatesigned chap.386
2012-08-06Assemblydelivered to governor
2012-06-20SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-20Senate3RD READING CAL.985
2012-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6522B
2012-04-25SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY
2012-04-25Assemblydelivered to senate
2012-04-25Assemblypassed assembly
2012-04-19Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.466
2012-04-18Assemblyreported
2012-04-02Assemblyprint number 9390b
2012-04-02Assemblyamend and recommit to judiciary
2012-03-07Assemblyprint number 9390a
2012-03-07Assemblyamend and recommit to judiciary
2012-03-06Assemblyreference changed to judiciary
2012-02-24Assemblyreferred to real property taxation

Same As/Similar To

S06522 (Same As) 2012-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9390B

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback