NY A09387 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-22 - signed chap.120
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-22 - signed chap.120
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends certain provisions authorizing the imposition of a required fee for admission to the New York Botanical Garden.
Title
Extends certain provisions authorizing the imposition of a required fee for admission to the New York Botanical Garden.
Sponsors
Asm. Mark Gjonaj [D] |
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-22 | Senate | signed chap.120 |
2014-07-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-10 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-10 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1019 |
2014-06-10 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7313 |
2014-06-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-05-19 | Assembly | amended on third reading 9387b |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.722 |
2014-05-13 | Assembly | reported |
2014-05-06 | Assembly | print number 9387a |
2014-05-06 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2014-05-06 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-04-23 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
Same As/Similar To
S07313 (Same As) 2014-06-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9387B