NY A09380 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-04 - signed chap.336
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-04 - signed chap.336
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the real property tax exemption for nuclear powered electric generating facilities to 2031.
Title
Extends the real property tax exemption for nuclear powered electric generating facilities to 2031.
Sponsors
Asm. Sandra Galef [D] | Asm. William Barclay [R] | Asm. Gary Pretlow [D] | Asm. Amy Paulin [D] |
Asm. Robert Oaks [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-04 | Senate | signed chap.336 |
2014-08-25 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-10 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-10 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.889 |
2014-06-10 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6660A |
2014-05-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2014-05-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-05-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.664 |
2014-05-06 | Assembly | reported |
2014-04-29 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-04-23 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S06660 (Same As) 2014-06-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9380