NY A09373 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-19 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-19 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires reports by state agencies relating to certain grants and expenditures made to community based organizations; requires listing by zip code of such grants.
Title
Requires reports by state agencies relating to certain grants and expenditures made to community based organizations; requires listing by zip code of such grants.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-04-23 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S01410 (Same As) 2014-06-09 - referred to ways and means