NY A09367 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - signed chap.499
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - signed chap.499
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to employment, by municipalities, of persons with disabilities; allows persons with disabilities who have held a position in the non-competitive class to be treated as holding a position in the competitive class in certain situations.
Title
Relates to employment, by municipalities, of persons with disabilities; allows persons with disabilities who have held a position in the non-competitive class to be treated as holding a position in the competitive class in certain situations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-17 | Senate | signed chap.499 |
2014-12-05 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-02 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-02 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.798 |
2014-06-02 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6998 |
2014-06-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.720 |
2014-05-13 | Assembly | reported |
2014-04-23 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S06998 (Same As) 2014-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9367