NY A09356 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-07 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-07 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to payment or delivery of property of judgment debtor.
Title
Relates to payment or delivery of property of judgment debtor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.634 |
2014-04-29 | Assembly | reported |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S07141 (Same As) 2014-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES