NY A09345 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-17 - substituted by s7030
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-17 - substituted by s7030
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the process for the imposition and collection of real property taxes within the county of Onondaga; relates to the adoption of the abstract of taxes for the city of Syracuse as part of the budget process for the county of Onondaga; relates to the date by which the county of Onondaga presents to the city of Syracuse the annual taxes to be imposed upon the real and personal property within the city.
Title
Relates to the process for the imposition and collection of real property taxes within the county of Onondaga; relates to the adoption of the abstract of taxes for the city of Syracuse as part of the budget process for the county of Onondaga; relates to the date by which the county of Onondaga presents to the city of Syracuse the annual taxes to be imposed upon the real and personal property within the city.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-17 | Assembly | substituted by s7030 |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.299 |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | rules report cal.299 |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-04-16 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S07030 (Same As) 2014-09-23 - SIGNED CHAP.390