NY A09344 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a special commission on compensation for state employees designated managerial or confidential; provides for the powers and duties of such commission.
Title
Establishes a special commission on compensation for state employees designated managerial or confidential; provides for the powers and duties of such commission.
Sponsors
Asm. Herman Farrell [D] | Asm. John McDonald [D] | Asm. Patricia Fahy [D] | Asm. Phillip Steck [D] |
Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D] | Asm. Donna Lupardo [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-17 | Senate | tabled |
2014-12-17 | Senate | vetoed memo.550 |
2014-12-05 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-10 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-10 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.731 |
2014-06-10 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7072 |
2014-06-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.855 |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | reported |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-04-16 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S07072 (Same As) 2014-06-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9344