NY A09337 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-22 - signed chap.118
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-22 - signed chap.118
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Marlborough, in the county of Ulster, to offer police officers Charles Hoffman and Arthur Terwilliger an optional 20 year retirement plan.
Title
Authorizes the town of Marlborough, in the county of Ulster, to offer police officers Charles Hoffman and Arthur Terwilliger an optional 20 year retirement plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-22 | Senate | signed chap.118 |
2014-07-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-18 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2014-06-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.990 |
2014-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6915 |
2014-06-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | home rule request |
2014-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.854 |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | reported |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-04-11 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S06915 (Same As) 2014-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9337