NY A09315 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - signed chap.450
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - signed chap.450
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a judge or peacemaker judge of any Indian tribal court, a chief, a headman, or any member of any tribal body of any nation, tribe or band of Indians in this state, duly designated for purpose of officiating at marriages, may solemnize a marriage.
Title
Provides that a judge or peacemaker judge of any Indian tribal court, a chief, a headman, or any member of any tribal body of any nation, tribe or band of Indians in this state, duly designated for purpose of officiating at marriages, may solemnize a marriage.
Sponsors
Asm. Addie Jenne [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-21 | Senate | signed chap.450 |
2014-11-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1538 |
2014-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7182 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.632 |
2014-04-29 | Assembly | reported |
2014-04-08 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S07182 (Same As) 2014-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9315