NY A09234 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-04 - signed chap.335
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-04 - signed chap.335
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the membership of the Saratoga county water authority.
Title
Relates to the membership of the Saratoga county water authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-04 | Senate | signed chap.335 |
2014-08-25 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-17 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-17 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.610 |
2014-06-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6934A |
2014-06-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.88 |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.88 |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | print number 9234a |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | amend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2014-04-02 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S06934 (Same As) 2014-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9234A