NY A09207 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-5)
Status: Introduced on March 31 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-29 - amended on third reading 9207b
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 31 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-29 - amended on third reading 9207b
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to candidates for certificates in the classroom teaching service.
Title
Relates to candidates for certificates in the classroom teaching service.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-29 | Assembly | amended on third reading 9207b |
2014-04-28 | Assembly | amended on third reading 9207a |
2014-04-24 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.583 |
2014-04-07 | Assembly | reported |
2014-03-31 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S07001 (Same As) 2014-04-11 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION
S07532 (Same As) 2014-05-15 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION
S07532 (Same As) 2014-05-15 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION