NY A09175 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - signed chap.449
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - signed chap.449
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to what constitutes doing an insurance business in the state.
Title
Relates to what constitutes doing an insurance business in the state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-21 | Senate | signed chap.449 |
2014-11-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-11 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-11 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.240 |
2014-06-11 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6505B |
2014-06-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.86 |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.86 |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | print number 9175a |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | amend and recommit to insurance |
2014-03-26 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S06505 (Same As) 2014-06-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9175A