NY A09090 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-7)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to designated viewers of audits provided to the federal clearinghouse.
Title
Relates to designated viewers of audits provided to the federal clearinghouse.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.553 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.553 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | print number 9090a |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2014-03-13 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S06827 (Same As) 2014-05-28 - PRINT NUMBER 6827A