NY A08865 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on June 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-06 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-06 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
To provide a technical correction to the tax law. Contrary to legislative intent, NYC Livery transportation services were included in a new transportation service tax provision created in the 09-10 budget. This legislation corrects that error by specifically excluding from the sales tax those community car services defined as "Livery" and "Base Station" by the New York City Taxi and Limousine Commission (TLC).
Title
Excludes livery that is dispatched from a central facility.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-06 | referred to ways and means | |
2009-06-17 | print number 8865b | |
2009-06-17 | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means | |
2009-06-16 | print number 8865a | |
2009-06-16 | amend and recommit to ways and means | |
2009-06-11 | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S6282 (Same As) 2010-01-06 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS