NY A08819 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-22 - signed chap.106
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-22 - signed chap.106
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the number of land banks authorized to exist in the state to twenty.
Title
Increases the number of land banks authorized to exist in the state to twenty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 119 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 119 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-22 | Senate | signed chap.106 |
2014-07-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-10 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-10 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.608 |
2014-06-10 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6731 |
2014-05-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-05-22 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.773 |
2014-05-19 | Assembly | reported |
2014-04-29 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-02-18 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S06731 (Same As) 2014-06-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8819