NY A08812 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-9)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-19 - substituted by s6803
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-19 - substituted by s6803
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the court to waive any mandatory surcharge and crime victim assistance fee when it is found that the defendant is a victim of sex trafficking.
Title
Requires the court to waive any mandatory surcharge and crime victim assistance fee when it is found that the defendant is a victim of sex trafficking.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s6803 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.549 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-02-14 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S06803 (Same As) 2014-09-23 - SIGNED CHAP.385