NY A08761 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to certain municipalities receiving state aid.
Title
Relates to certain municipalities receiving state aid.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-21 | Senate | tabled |
2014-11-21 | Senate | vetoed memo.498 |
2014-11-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-16 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-16 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1091 |
2014-06-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7625B |
2014-06-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | amended on third reading 8761c |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | amended on third reading 8761b |
2014-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.830 |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | reported |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-03-04 | Assembly | print number 8761a |
2014-03-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2014-02-12 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S07625 (Same As) 2014-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8761C