NY A08474 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Status: Introduced on June 17 2011 - 25% progress, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-12 - amend and recommit to rules 8474b
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires notification of parents when student directory personally identifiable information is released to third parties; provides an opportunity to opt out.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires notification of parents when student directory personally identifiable information is released to third parties; provides an opportunity to opt out.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-06-12Assemblyamend and recommit to rules 8474b
2012-06-06Assemblyreported referred to rules
2012-01-13Assemblyprint number 8474a
2012-01-13Assemblyamend and recommit to education
2012-01-04Assemblyreferred to education
2011-06-17Assemblyreferred to education

Same As/Similar To

S02357 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback