NY A08343 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 78-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-10 - amended on third reading (t) 8343a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-10 - amended on third reading (t) 8343a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the increase in the minimum wage and provides that on December 31st, 2016 and each December 31st thereafter, the rate shall be indexed to inflation.
Title
Relates to the increase in the minimum wage and provides that on December 31st, 2016 and each December 31st thereafter, the rate shall be indexed to inflation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-10 | Assembly | amended on third reading (t) 8343a |
2014-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.822 |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | reported |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-01-09 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S06518 (Same As) 2014-06-11 - PRINT NUMBER 6518A