NY A08316 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-9)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the payment by the state of the costs of an evaluation and early intervention services to eligible children.
Title
Provides for the payment by the state of the costs of an evaluation and early intervention services to eligible children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.455 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.455 |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | held for consideration in ways and means |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | print number 8316b |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | print number 8316a |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2014-01-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to health |
2013-12-18 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S06002 (Same As) 2014-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES