NY A08231 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Passed on November 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-07 - signed chap.429
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Passed on November 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-07 - signed chap.429
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the imposition of any additional fee for the issuance of a driver's license or non-driver identification card with a veteran's distinguishing mark.
Title
Prohibits the imposition of any additional fee for the issuance of a driver's license or non-driver identification card with a veteran's distinguishing mark.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-07 | Senate | signed chap.429 |
2014-11-07 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-16 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-16 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1393 |
2014-06-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5955A |
2014-05-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-05-22 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.765 |
2014-05-19 | Assembly | reported |
2014-05-06 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-05-02 | Assembly | print number 8231a |
2014-05-02 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2013-11-06 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S05955 (Same As) 2014-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8231A