NY A08185 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-23 - signed chap.185
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-23 - signed chap.185
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases penalties for stealing of companion animals to one thousand dollars.
Title
Increases penalties for stealing of companion animals to one thousand dollars.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-23 | Senate | signed chap.185 |
2014-07-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1500 |
2014-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7684A |
2014-06-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.153 |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.153 |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-03 | Assembly | print number 8185b |
2014-06-03 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to rules |
2014-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-05-20 | Assembly | print number 8185a |
2014-05-20 | Assembly | amend and recommit to agriculture |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2013-10-04 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S07684 (Same As) 2014-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8185B