NY A08137 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-5)
Status: Passed on September 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-23 - signed chap.364
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-5)
Status: Passed on September 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-23 - signed chap.364
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes insurance coverage for equipment and supplies used for the treatment of ostomies.
Title
Authorizes insurance coverage for equipment and supplies used for the treatment of ostomies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-23 | Senate | signed chap.364 |
2014-09-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1558 |
2014-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5937A |
2014-06-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.268 |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | rules report cal.268 |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-06-06 | Assembly | print number 8137a |
2014-06-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to insurance |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2013-08-30 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S05937 (Same As) 2014-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8137A