NY A07720 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-23 - signed chap.184
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-23 - signed chap.184
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to unlawful surveillance with the use of a GPS device.
Title
Relates to unlawful surveillance with the use of a GPS device.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-23 | Senate | signed chap.184 |
2014-07-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-05-28 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-05-28 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-05-28 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.471 |
2014-05-28 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4187C |
2014-04-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2014-04-29 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-04-29 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-04-24 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.569 |
2014-04-07 | Assembly | reported |
2014-04-03 | Assembly | print number 7720b |
2014-04-03 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | print number 7720a |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2013-05-31 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S04187 (Same As) 2014-05-28 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7720B