NY A07669 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the collection of certain demographic information about the sexual orientation and gender identity by certain state agencies, boards and commissions.
Title
Requires the collection of certain demographic information about the sexual orientation and gender identity by certain state agencies, boards and commissions.
Sponsors
Asm. Harry Bronson [D] | Asm. Matthew Titone [D] | Asm. Joan Millman [D] | Asm. Walter Mosley [D] |
Asm. Phillip Steck [D] | Asm. Deborah Glick [D] | Asm. Michelle Schimel [D] | Asm. Fred Thiele [D] |
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 101 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.145 |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.145 |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-04-11 | Assembly | print number 7669a |
2014-04-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S07319 (Same As) 2014-05-12 - REFERRED TO FINANCE