NY A07277 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Introduced on May 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-28 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-28 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the use and sale of tobacco at state-operated institutions of the State University of New York.
Title
Prohibits the use and sale of tobacco at state-operated institutions of the State University of New York.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-28 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-04-24 | Assembly | print number 7277b |
2014-04-24 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to higher education |
2014-02-19 | Assembly | print number 7277a |
2014-02-19 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2013-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2013-05-08 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S04853 (Same As) 2014-04-23 - PRINT NUMBER 4853B