NY A07167 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - signed chap.438
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - signed chap.438
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes telephone and telegraph corporations to issue stocks, bonds or other forms of indebtedness for the purposes of expanding broadband services when such corporation is receiving a federal grant or loan therefor.
Title
Authorizes telephone and telegraph corporations to issue stocks, bonds or other forms of indebtedness for the purposes of expanding broadband services when such corporation is receiving a federal grant or loan therefor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-21 | Senate | signed chap.438 |
2014-11-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-17 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-17 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.920 |
2014-06-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5863A |
2014-05-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2014-05-06 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-05-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.607 |
2014-04-28 | Assembly | reported |
2014-03-04 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-02-12 | Assembly | print number 7167e |
2014-02-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2014-01-13 | Assembly | committed to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.344 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-06-21 | Senate | returned to senate |
2013-06-21 | Assembly | repassed assembly |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | amended on third reading 7167d |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-18 | Senate | recalled from senate |
2013-06-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | amended on third reading 7167c |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.250 |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | rules report cal.250 |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-06-07 | Assembly | print number 7167b |
2013-06-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2013-06-06 | Assembly | print number 7167a |
2013-06-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2013-05-03 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S04395 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO INFRASTRUCTURE AND CAPITAL INVESTMENT
S05863 (Same As) 2014-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7167E
S05863 (Same As) 2014-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7167E