NY A07133 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-17 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-17 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes certain counties, cities and school districts to impose up to a four percent rate of sales and compensating use taxes; preserves the authority of certain counties and a city to impose such taxes at rates in excess of four percent.
Title
Authorizes certain counties, cities and school districts to impose up to a four percent rate of sales and compensating use taxes; preserves the authority of certain counties and a city to impose such taxes at rates in excess of four percent.
Sponsors
Asm. Sandra Galef [D] | Asm. Steve Katz [R] | Asm. Janet Duprey [R] | Asm. Andrew Goodell [R] |
Asm. Jose Rivera [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-17 | Assembly | held for consideration in ways and means |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2013-06-21 | Assembly | print number 7133a |
2013-06-21 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2013-05-01 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |