NY A06914 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on November 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-07 - signed chap.427
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on November 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-07 - signed chap.427
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to non-contributory retirement service credit for members of the New York city retirement systems called to military duty on or after September eleventh, two thousand one and prior to January first, two thousand six.
Title
Relates to non-contributory retirement service credit for members of the New York city retirement systems called to military duty on or after September eleventh, two thousand one and prior to January first, two thousand six.
Sponsors
Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] | Asm. William Colton [D] | Asm. Nick Perry [D] | Asm. Michael Benedetto [D] |
Asm. Michael Cusick [D] |
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-07 | Senate | signed chap.427 |
2014-11-07 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1603 |
2014-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4819A |
2014-06-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.347 |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.347 |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-04-29 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | print number 6914a |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2014-01-22 | Assembly | committed to governmental employees |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.325 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.438 |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.438 |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-04-24 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S04819 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6914A