NY A06839 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-05 - REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES
Pending: Senate Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-05 - REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES
Pending: Senate Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the offering of twelve month work exemption to certain parents or relatives in receipt of public assistance who personally provide child care.
Title
Authorizes the offering of twelve month work exemption to certain parents or relatives in receipt of public assistance who personally provide child care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 86 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
2014-03-05 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-03-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-03-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.11 |
2014-03-05 | Assembly | rules report cal.11 |
2014-03-04 | Assembly | reported |
2014-03-04 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-03-04 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-02-28 | Assembly | print number 6839a |
2014-02-28 | Assembly | amend and recommit to social services |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to social services |
2013-05-16 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.363 |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | reported |
2013-04-30 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-04-19 | Assembly | referred to social services |
Same As/Similar To
S04967 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES