NY A06815 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 19 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-16 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 19 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-16 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Eid-al-Adha and Eid-Al-Fitr as school holidays in certain school districts.
Title
Establishes Eid-al-Adha and Eid-Al-Fitr as school holidays in certain school districts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-16 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-06-13 | Assembly | print number 6815a |
2014-06-13 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to education |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to education |
2013-04-19 | Assembly | referred to education |