NY A06328 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-18 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-18 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to regulation of toxic chemicals in children's products; establishes the interstate chemical clearinghouse.
Title
Relates to regulation of toxic chemicals in children's products; establishes the interstate chemical clearinghouse.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 111 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2014-03-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-03-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.292 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-04-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-04-18 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.164 |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | reported |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2013-03-25 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S04614 (Same As) 2014-06-13 - PRINT NUMBER 4614A