NY A06234 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on July 31 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-07-31 - signed chap.199
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to automated teller machine fee disclosure; eliminates provisions requiring an automated teller machine operator to post a sign that a fee is imposed for the use of such machine, as well as the amount of such fee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to automated teller machine fee disclosure; eliminates provisions requiring an automated teller machine operator to post a sign that a fee is imposed for the use of such machine, as well as the amount of such fee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-29 - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-07-31Senatesigned chap.199
2013-07-19Assemblydelivered to governor
2013-05-29SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2013-05-29SenatePASSED SENATE
2013-05-29Senate3RD READING CAL.450
2013-05-29SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S4363
2013-05-06SenateREFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
2013-05-06Assemblydelivered to senate
2013-05-06Assemblypassed assembly
2013-05-02Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.264
2013-04-30Assemblyreported
2013-04-23Assemblyreported referred to codes
2013-03-18Assemblyreferred to banks

Same As/Similar To

S04363 (Same As) 2013-05-29 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6234

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback