NY A06213 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-19 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-19 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the New York state interagency coordinating council for service-disabled veterans; defines the powers and duties of the council and requires an annual report by the council to the governor, the temporary president of the senate and the speaker of the assembly.
Title
Establishes the New York state interagency coordinating council for service-disabled veterans; defines the powers and duties of the council and requires an annual report by the council to the governor, the temporary president of the senate and the speaker of the assembly.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2014-05-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-05-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.603 |
2014-04-28 | Assembly | reported |
2014-02-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-01-29 | Assembly | print number 6213b |
2014-01-29 | Assembly | amend and recommit to veterans' affairs |
2014-01-13 | Assembly | committed to veterans' affairs |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.287 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-06-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2013-06-03 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-05-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.421 |
2013-05-22 | Assembly | reported |
2013-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-05-07 | Assembly | print number 6213a |
2013-05-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to veterans' affairs |
2013-03-15 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S02392 (Same As) 2013-05-29 - PRINT NUMBER 2392A