NY A06051 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-07 - print number 6051a
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-07 - print number 6051a
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires all health insurance policies to provide insurance coverage for the cost of hearing aids; provides that such coverage shall include coverage of at least $1,000 over a three year period; provides that children under the age of sixteen are allowed reimbursement for expenses related to the purchase of up to two hearing aids.
Title
Requires all health insurance policies to provide insurance coverage for the cost of hearing aids; provides that such coverage shall include coverage of at least $1,000 over a three year period; provides that children under the age of sixteen are allowed reimbursement for expenses related to the purchase of up to two hearing aids.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | Assembly | print number 6051a |
2014-04-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to insurance |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2013-03-13 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S03937 (Same As) 2014-03-26 - PRINT NUMBER 3937A