NY A05583 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-04 - print number 5583a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-04 - print number 5583a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a farm savings account program.
Title
Establishes a farm savings account program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-04 | Assembly | print number 5583a |
2014-03-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2013-03-04 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S03692 (Same As) 2014-04-29 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE