NY A05424 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 64-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-16 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-16 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Suspends the issuance of permits for drilling wells for natural gas extraction in certain areas.
Title
Suspends the issuance of permits for drilling wells for natural gas extraction in certain areas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 103 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | amended on third reading 5424b |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.254 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-03-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2013-03-06 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-03-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-03-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.37 |
2013-03-05 | Assembly | rules report cal.37 |
2013-03-05 | Assembly | reported |
2013-03-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-03-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-03-04 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2013-03-01 | Assembly | print number 5424a |
2013-03-01 | Assembly | amend and recommit to environmental conservation |
2013-02-26 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S04236 (Same As) 2014-06-10 - PRINT NUMBER 4236B