NY A05410 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-16 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-16 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to appointments to the water board of the city of New York.
Title
Relates to appointments to the water board of the city of New York.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 117 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-16 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-05-06 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-01-13 | Assembly | committed to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.253 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-06-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2013-06-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-06-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.115 |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.115 |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-03-19 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-02-25 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S03598 (Same As) 2014-06-10 - referred to ways and means