NY A05388 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - signed chap.489
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - signed chap.489
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the reporting requirements relative to restitution and fair treatment standards for the office of victims services from annual to every two years; consolidates reporting requirements regarding victims service programs; requires information collected by local and state probation departments relating to victim impact statements to be included in the biennial report.
Title
Changes the reporting requirements relative to restitution and fair treatment standards for the office of victims services from annual to every two years; consolidates reporting requirements regarding victims service programs; requires information collected by local and state probation departments relating to victim impact statements to be included in the biennial report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-17 | Senate | signed chap.489 |
2014-12-05 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-11 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-11 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1305 |
2014-06-11 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7581 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2014-04-07 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-04-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.252 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-04-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2013-04-24 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-04-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-03-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.36 |
2013-03-05 | Assembly | rules report cal.36 |
2013-03-05 | Assembly | reported |
2013-03-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-03-04 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2013-02-25 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S07581 (Same As) 2014-06-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5388