NY A05087 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-25 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-25 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to violations and a mandatory surcharge for parking in a bicycle lane.
Title
Relates to violations and a mandatory surcharge for parking in a bicycle lane.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-25 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2013-02-20 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S02809 (Same As) 2013-01-23 - REFERRED TO CITIES