NY A04971 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-18 - amended by restoring to previous print 4971a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-18 - amended by restoring to previous print 4971a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the definition of all terrain vehicles to include certain vehicles of up to seventy inches long and 1500 pounds which consist of a side-by-side passenger configuration for up to three passengers and which include certain safety features.
Title
Amends the definition of all terrain vehicles to include certain vehicles of up to seventy inches long and 1500 pounds which consist of a side-by-side passenger configuration for up to three passengers and which include certain safety features.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-18 | Assembly | amended by restoring to previous print 4971a |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | print number 4971b |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | print number 4971a |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2013-02-13 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S01946 (Same As) 2014-06-16 - referred to ways and means