NY A04741 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-18 - signed chap.354
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-18 - signed chap.354
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to expanding the TRIS-free children and babies act; expands the definition of "TRIS" to include TDCPP (TRIS (1,3-dichloro-2-propyl) phosphate).
Title
Relates to expanding the TRIS-free children and babies act; expands the definition of "TRIS" to include TDCPP (TRIS (1,3-dichloro-2-propyl) phosphate).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-18 | Senate | signed chap.354 |
2014-09-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-10 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-10 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.339 |
2014-06-10 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3703B |
2014-01-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2014-01-27 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-01-27 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.213 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-05-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2013-05-01 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-05-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-04-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.214 |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | reported |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2013-02-08 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S03703 (Same As) 2014-06-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4741