NY A04735 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-23 - signed chap.358
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-23 - signed chap.358
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires operators of petting zoos to maintain hand washing or hand cleansing facilities for persons attending such petting zoos within no more than fifty feet of the exit from the petting zoo area; and requires other public establishments featuring animals that patrons may reasonably come in contact with to provide hand washing or hand cleansing facilities.
Title
Requires operators of petting zoos to maintain hand washing or hand cleansing facilities for persons attending such petting zoos within no more than fifty feet of the exit from the petting zoo area; and requires other public establishments featuring animals that patrons may reasonably come in contact with to provide hand washing or hand cleansing facilities.
Sponsors
Asm. Nick Perry [D] | Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] | Asm. Barbara Clark [D] | Asm. Sandra Galef [D] |
Asm. Harvey Weisenberg [D] |
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 115 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-23 | Senate | signed chap.358 |
2014-09-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1655 |
2014-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7846 |
2014-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.129 |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.129 |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-06-04 | Assembly | print number 4735a |
2014-06-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2014-01-14 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to health |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2013-02-08 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S07846 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4735A