NY A04564 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-17 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-17 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Reduces the rate at which a taxpayer's entire net income base shall be computed for the purposes of the franchise tax on business corporations.
Title
Reduces the rate at which a taxpayer's entire net income base shall be computed for the purposes of the franchise tax on business corporations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-17 | Assembly | held for consideration in ways and means |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2013-11-27 | Assembly | print number 4564a |
2013-11-27 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2013-02-06 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |