NY A04403 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-11 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-11 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to exemptions available to veterans.
Title
Relates to exemptions available to veterans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-11 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-02-19 | Assembly | print number 4403a |
2014-02-19 | Assembly | amend and recommit to veterans' affairs |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
2013-04-15 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-02-05 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S03523 (Same As) 2014-02-19 - PRINT NUMBER 3523A