NY A04143 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-24 - print number 4143a
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-24 - print number 4143a
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "omnibus telecommunications reform act of 2014".
Title
Enacts the "omnibus telecommunications reform act of 2014".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-24 | Assembly | print number 4143a |
2014-01-24 | Assembly | amend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2013-02-01 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S03175 (Same As) 2014-01-29 - PRINT NUMBER 3175A