NY A03552 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-12 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-12 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires gas and electric utilities to make available to landlords or lessors, upon request of prospective tenants or lessees, information concerning gas and electric charges incurred for residential rental premises; provides that such information shall be furnished without any charge or fee.
Title
Requires gas and electric utilities to make available to landlords or lessors, upon request of prospective tenants or lessees, information concerning gas and electric charges incurred for residential rental premises; provides that such information shall be furnished without any charge or fee.
Sponsors
Asm. Karim Camara [D] | Asm. Annette Robinson [D] | Asm. Keith Wright [D] | Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] |
Asm. Michael Miller [D] | Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D] | Asm. Nick Perry [D] | Asm. Barbara Clark [D] |
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.174 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-04-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2013-04-29 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-04-29 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-04-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.209 |
2013-04-22 | Assembly | reported |
2013-01-28 | Assembly | referred to energy |
Same As/Similar To
S01736 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS